Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Obstruction Hanging From Rearview Mirror - Enforcement
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Montgomery, Zirkin, Brochin, Cassilly, Gladden, Hough, Lee, Muse, Norman, Raskin, and Ready
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for enforcement only as a secondary offense for a violation of the prohibition under specified circumstances against a person driving a vehicle on a highway with any object, material, or obstruction hanging from the rearview mirror that interferes with the clear view of the driver through the windshield.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/05/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {628573/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/05/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/05/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {628573/1 Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 38
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM