Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Life Insurers - Reserve Investments - Loans Secured by Real Estate
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the maximum term, to not more than 30 years, of specified loans on specified nonresidential and nonfarm real estate that a life insurer may include in its reserve investments; and making conforming changes.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/03/2015 3/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 34
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 38
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
(   5-511 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page