Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Services Education - Modifications
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Benson, Brochin, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Ferguson, Gladden, Klausmeier, Lee, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, Waugh, Young, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring county boards of education and the State to provide a specified amount to the State Department of Education for specified individuals receiving education services at specified facilities; requiring that teachers and other professional personnel providing educational services at specified facilities be paid an annual salary that is at least equal to the average annual salary of teachers and other professional personnel in the county that provides the highest average annual salary; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-301, 22-302, 22-303, 22-306.1, 22-306.2, 22-307, 22-309, 22-310, 6-302 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:26 AM