Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senators King, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Carozza, Eckardt, Edwards, Ellis, Feldman, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Hershey, Jennings, Kagan, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, Miller, Patterson, Peters, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Simonaire, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the Maryland Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped to be the Maryland Library for the Blind and Print Disabled; and altering the appointed membership of the Maryland State Library Board to include a blind patron of the Maryland Library for the Blind and Print Disabled.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0604
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted 35
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - State Libraries - Library for the Blind and Physically Handicapped and State Library Board - Alterations
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Ways and Means 38
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 52
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:32 AM