Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources Police - Conditions of Sentencing, Probation, Parole, or Mandatory Release Supervision - Database
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Judiciary to notify the Department of Natural Resources of any person who is subject to a condition of sentencing or probation that specifically prohibits the person from engaging in any identified activity on the waters of the State or any recreational or commercial hunting or fishing activity; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to notify the Department of Natural Resources of any person who is subject to specified terms of parole or mandatory release supervision; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2016 1/27/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-201.1, 1-211 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM