Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsored by
Senator Gladden
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a vulnerable adult abuse registry; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish and maintain a registry containing the names of specified individuals; requiring that names and information contained in the registry be available for public inspection; authorizing the Department to discharge specified responsibilities in a specified manner; requiring a State agency that makes a specified finding to notify the Department in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0326
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2013 1/23/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1101 through 11-1105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM