Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-Felons
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Vote on Veto Special Ordered until 4/8/2016
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified qualifications for voter registration; and providing that individuals discharged from incarceration are qualified to register to vote; and making a conforming change.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0980
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2015 3/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Favorable with Amendments {854039/1 36
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Conway) Adopted 36
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments {854039/1 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Committee Amendment Withdrawn 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {483321/1 37
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 37
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Substitute Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {483321/1 38
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 38
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Substitute Committee Amendment {483321/1 Withdrawn 41
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Substitute Committee Amendment {634436/1 Adopted 41
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (31-16) 41
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {603922/1 Rejected (19-28) 41
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Ready) {853821/1 Rejected (19-28) 41
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Third Reading Passed (29-18) 43
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 44
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments {775663/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Turner) Adopted 61
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Motion Special Order until later today (Delegate B. Wilson) Rejected (60-75) 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Wilson) {543929/2 Rejected (58-81) 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Vogt) {313825/1 Rejected (52-84) 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Vogt) {903223/1 Rejected (54-81) 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (82-56) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments (29-18) 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (29-18) 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 5/26/2015 5/22/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Senate 1/20/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/21/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Senate 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/5/2016 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/9/2016 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Veto overridden (29-18)
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 3/1/2016 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 3/31/2016 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 4/8/2016 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
3/12/2015 Amendments Senate - (Senator Conway) {483321/01 Withdrawn
3/12/2015 Amendments Senate - (Senator Hershey) {603922/01 Rejected
3/12/2015 Amendments Senate - (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) {634436/01 Adopted
3/12/2015 Amendments Senate - (Senator Ready) {853821/01 Rejected
3/06/2015 Amendments Senate - (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) {854039/01 Withdrawn
4/08/2015 Amendments House - (Delegate Vogt) {313825/01 Rejected
4/08/2015 Amendments House - (Delegate Wilson, B.) {543929/02 Rejected
4/06/2015 Amendments House - (Ways and Means) {775663/01 Adopted
4/08/2015 Amendments House - (Delegate Vogt) {903223/01 Rejected
2/06/2015 Text - First - Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-Felons
3/12/2015 Text - Third - Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-Felons
4/09/2015 Text - Enrolled - Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-Felons
7/08/2015 Governor's Veto Letter
3/03/2015 Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2015 Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
2/09/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Veto override (29-18) - 02/9/16
3/12/2015 Vote - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (31-16) - 03/12/15
3/12/2015 Vote - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Hershey) {603922/1 Rejected (19-28) - 03/12/15
3/12/2015 Vote - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Ready) {853821/1 Rejected (19-28) - 03/12/15
3/16/2015 Vote - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (29-18) - 03/16/15
4/02/2015 Vote - Senate Floor - Senate Concur - House Amendments (29-18) - 04/02/15
4/02/2015 Vote - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (29-18) - 04/02/15
4/02/2015 Vote - House Floor - Motion Special Order until later today (Wilson) Rejected (60-75) - 04/02/15
4/02/2015 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Wilson) {543929/2 Rejected (58-81) - 04/02/15
4/02/2015 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Vogt) {313825/1 Rejected (52-84) - 04/02/15
4/02/2015 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Vogt) {903223/1 Rejected (54-81) - 04/02/15
4/02/2015 Vote - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (82-56) - 04/02/15
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-202, 3-102 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM