Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Real Estate Commission – Continuing Education Requirements – Ethics and Professionalism
Sponsored by
Senators Patterson, Carozza, Gallion, Lam, and Pinsky
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the subject matter of the continuing education ethics course required for the renewal of a license to provide real estate brokerage services by the State Real Estate Commission; and requiring the course to cover the subjects of the practice of flipping, fraudulent real estate practices, and professionalism as it relates to the Maryland Code of Ethics, including a discussion relating to conflict resolution and a licensee's duty to respect the public, peers, and property.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1446
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2020
Legislative Date
1/23/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {594231/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2020 1/23/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Real Estate Commission – Continuing Education Requirements – Ethics and Professionalism
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {594231/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - State Real Estate Commission – Continuing Education Requirements – Ethics and Professionalism
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Economic Matters 47B
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (131-0) 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 53
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:45 AM