Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability Act
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin and Zirkin
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Voiding a provision of a specified contract or agreement that attempts or purports to waive specified rights or reduce specified liability as against public policy; providing for the treatment of specified information relating to a chemical constituent used in hydraulic fracturing for the purposes of specified action; requiring a permittee to file with the Department of the Environment and a specified local health department documentation stating the composition of the injection fluid used for hydraulic fracturing of the well; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {268372/1
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {268372/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {213627/1
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {213627/1
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {213627/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {213627/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senators Zirkin and Edwards) {503325/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-5)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {268372/1 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 39
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Favorable with Amendments {268372/1 Report Adopted 41
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {213627/1 41
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted 41
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {213627/1 42
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 42
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {213627/1 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 44
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {213627/1 Withdrawn 45
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Floor Amendment (Senators Zirkin and Edwards) {503325/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (41-5) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 47
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/22/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2016 3/29/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/29/2016 3/29/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-2101 through 3-2105 )
(   14-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM