Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Open Meetings - Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Beidle, Benson, Carter, Cassilly, Eckardt, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Hester, Hough, Jennings, Lam, Lee, McCray, Miller, Patterson, Pinsky, Ready, Reilly, Smith, Washington, West, and Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 203
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain State agencies to make available on their websites open meeting agendas 48 hours in advance of each meeting; requiring certain State agencies to post on their websites meeting minutes not more than 2 business days after the minutes are approved; requiring certain state agencies to maintain on their websites meeting minutes for 5 years and recordings for 1 year after the meeting; requiring the Department of Information Technology to provide certain staff, support, and equipment to the Maryland Transportation Authority; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0421
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {794039/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {876086/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (134-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 203
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Government - Open Meetings - Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {794039/1 Adopted 35
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - State Government - Open Meetings - Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 38
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {876086/1 Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (134-0) 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 48A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Government - Open Meetings - Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 203
Text - Chapter - State Government - Open Meetings - Requirements and Application of Open Meetings Act (Maryland State Agency Transparency Act)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-604, 10-607 )
(   2-101, 2-102 )
(   2-101, 2-108 )
(   4-201, 4-211 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:02 PM