Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Possession of Marijuana - Civil Offense
Sponsored by
Senators Zirkin and Kittleman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making the use or possession of less than 10 grams of marijuana a civil rather than a criminal offense; establishing that a person who violates the Act may be issued a citation; establishing fines; requiring a court to order a specified person who has committed a third or subsequent violation of the Act to appear in court and to attend a specified drug education program; requiring a court to refer the person for assessment for substance abuse disorder and to refer the person for substance abuse treatment if necessary; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable 42
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Dyson) Rejected (21-22) 42
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Shank) {143625/3 42
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Laid Over (Senator Getty) Adopted 42
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Shank) {143625/3 Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Shank) {313329/2 Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Third Reading Passed (36-8) 45
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 First Reading Judiciary 47
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {692914/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Mitchell) {463225/1 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Special Order until 4/5 (Delegate Vallario) Adopted 64
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Mitchell) {463225/1 Withdrawn 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Floor Committee Amendment {352611/2 Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Special Order until next session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Floor Committee Amendment {422317/1 Adopted 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Hough) {543821/1 Rejected (58-72) 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Parrott) {323825/1 Rejected (45-87) 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Afzali) {343021/2 Rejected (54-78) 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Afzali) {713125/1 Rejected (42-87) 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Impallaria) {793421/1 Rejected (40-89) 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Ready) {603728/1 Rejected (38-93) 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted 66
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (78-55) 66
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (34-8) 63
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
3/12/2014 Amendments Senate - (Senator Shank) {143625/03 Adopted
3/12/2014 Amendments Senate - (Senator Shank) {313329/02 Adopted
4/05/2014 Amendments House - (Delegate Parrott) {323825/01 Rejected
4/05/2014 Amendments House - (Delegate Afzali) {343021/02 Rejected
4/05/2014 Amendments House - (Judiciary) {352611/02 Adopted
4/05/2014 Amendments House - (Judiciary) {422317/01 Adopted
4/05/2014 Amendments House - (Delegate Mitchell) {463225/01 Withdrawn
4/05/2014 Amendments House - (Delegate Hough) {543821/01 Rejected
4/05/2014 Amendments House - (Delegate Ready) {603728/01 Rejected
4/03/2014 Amendments House - (Judiciary) {692914/01 Adopted
4/05/2014 Amendments House - (Delegate Afzali) {713125/01 Rejected
4/05/2014 Amendments House - (Delegate Impallaria) {793421/01 Rejected
1/22/2014 Text - First - Criminal Law - Possession of Marijuana - Civil Offense
3/12/2014 Text - Third - Criminal Law - Possession of Marijuana - Civil Offense
4/08/2014 Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Possession of Marijuana - Civil Offense
4/18/2014 Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Possession of Marijuana - Civil Offense
3/10/2014 Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2014 Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
3/08/2014 Vote - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Dyson) Rejected (21-22) - 03/08/14
3/11/2014 Vote - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-8) - 03/11/14
3/29/2014 Vote - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-8) - 03/29/14
3/30/2014 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Hough) {543821/1 Rejected (58-72) - 03/30/14
3/30/2014 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Parrott) {323825/1 Rejected (45-87) - 03/30/14
3/30/2014 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Afzali) {343021/2 Rejected (54-78) - 03/30/14
3/30/2014 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Afzali) {713125/1 Rejected (42-87) - 03/30/14
3/30/2014 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Impallaria) {793421/1 Rejected (40-89) - 03/30/14
3/30/2014 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Ready) {603728/1 Rejected (38-93) - 03/30/14
3/30/2014 Vote - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (78-55) - 03/30/14
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM