Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Selection, Qualifications, and Term of Office
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Jennings, Kagan, Kasemeyer, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Middleton, Miller, Montgomery, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Young, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution repealing provisions relating to election of circuit court judges; requiring the Governor, by and with the advice and consent of the Senate, to appoint a qualified person to fill a vacancy in the office of a judge of the circuit court; altering the term of office of circuit court judges from 15 to 10 years; requiring the Governor to reappoint a circuit court judge, by and with the advice and consent of the Senate, upon the expiration of the judge's term; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0582
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18B, 2, 21A, 3, 5, 5B )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM