Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsored by
Senators West, Carozza, Eckardt, Gallion, Hough, Salling, and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which certain indemnity and defense liability contract or agreement language concerning the provision of certain construction-related services is void and unenforceable to include damages arising out of economic loss.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2019
Legislative Date
2/19/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2019 2/19/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page