Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Prekindergarten Programs - Notification of Eligibility by Local Departments of Social Services
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, King, Benson, Currie, Guzzone, Kelley, Klausmeier, Madaleno, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Raskin, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified local departments of social services and specified local health departments, under specified circumstances, to provide specified parents or guardians with an oral and written notice that their child may be eligible for publicly funded prekindergarten programs; requiring specified local departments of social services and specified local health departments to report annually to the General Assembly on the number of parents who were given a notification and who subsequently enrolled their child in the specified program; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1095
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {184034/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/12/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {184034/1 Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 38
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 61
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/12/2016 4/12/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-101.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM