Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Unmanned Aircraft Systems Research, Development, Regulation, and Privacy Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Astle, Feldman, Hershey, Lee, Madaleno, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that only the State may enact a law or take other action to prohibit, restrict, or regulate the testing or operation of unmanned aircraft systems; requiring the Department of Business and Economic Development, in consultation with other specified institutions, to study specified benefits and concerns; requiring specified State and local government entities and officials to review the use of unmanned aircraft systems and report their findings to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 31, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {137578/1 Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Mathias) {333426/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {913428/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 49
House 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {380019/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-1) 66
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM