Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) Schools Act of 2016
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Jennings, Mathias, Muse, Norman, Ready, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing specified State-funded Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) schools in the State; authorizing specified planning grants for P-TECH schools; requiring specified P-TECH schools to reserve at least 50% of its available space for students who meet the free and reduced price meal income criteria; requiring the State to provide a specified grant to P-TECH schools beginning in fiscal year 2017 for P-TECH school costs; providing that the grant may not exceed a specified amount in specified fiscal years; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0464
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {754732/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-1)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (134-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 12
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 4/07/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {754732/2 Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (43-1) 62
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 65
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (134-0) 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-1701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM