Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C-3 License
Sponsored by
Harford County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, in Harford County, the membership qualifications for a social organization that may be issued a certain 6-day or 7-day Class C-3 beer, wine, and liquor license by the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to include first responders.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0972
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C-3 License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C-3 License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C-3 License
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C-3 License
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Economic Matters 47
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:36 AM