Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing in Baltimore County the holder of a manufacturer's license or a wholesaler's license to sell or deliver alcoholic beverages to a holder of a retail alcoholic beverages license on Sunday; and authorizing holders of certain classes of retail alcoholic beverages licenses to sell alcoholic beverages on Sunday during the same hours as on the other days of the week.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0743 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-3)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-3) 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Economic Matters 46A
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-102, 13-2003, 13-2004, 13-402, 13-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM