Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Kent County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified property tax credit for specified business entities that obtain specified new, improved, or expanded premises in specified commerce zones in Kent County; providing for the amount and duration of the property tax credit; authorizing the governing body of Kent County to provide, by law, for specified matters relating to the tax credit; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2015.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0302
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Kent County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {399436/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Kent County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {585565/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Kent County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Kent County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Kent County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {399436/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Kent County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Ways and Means 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {585565/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Kent County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Text - Chapter - Kent County - Property Tax Credit - Commerce Zones
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page