Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Community Solar Energy Generating System Program
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Ramirez, Muse, Middleton, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Klausmeier, and Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a pilot program on community solar energy generating systems under the authority of the Public Service Commission; providing for the structure and operation of the program, including the generation of electricity and allocation of costs to subscribers to the community solar energy generating system; requiring the Commission to limit the program so that the Commission may conduct a meaningful study of the program's results; requiring the Commission to adopt specified regulations on or before May 15, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {767070/1
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Raskin) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {767070/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {493293/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {823690/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (122-17)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments {767070/1 39
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Laid Over (Senator Raskin) Adopted 39
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments {767070/1 Report Adopted 40
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 42
House 3/16/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 43A
House 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2015 4/08/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments {493293/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Floor Committee Amendment {823690/1 Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (122-17) 64
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendment 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:39 PM