Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsored by
Senators Astle, Benson, Feldman, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, and Rosapepe
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 815
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified insured to obtain specified enhanced underinsured motorist coverage, instead of specified uninsured motorist coverage, under a private passenger motor vehicle liability insurance policy; requiring specified insurers to offer specified enhanced underinsured motorist coverage under specified circumstances; providing for the characteristics of the enhanced underinsured motorist coverage; applying the Act to motor vehicle policies issued, sold, or delivered in the State on or after July 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0005
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Supplemental Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {167472/1 Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Text - Third - Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 36
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Economic Matters 39
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (106-34) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 815
Text - Chapter - Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-509, 19-509.1, 19-509.2, 19-510, 19-511, 19-511.1, 19-513 )
(   17-103 )
Last Updated: 11/13/2019 12:55 PM