Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Education - State Superintendent of Schools - Appointment
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Conway, King, and Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to appoint or reappoint the State Superintendent of Schools with the advice and consent of the Senate by April 1; requiring the State Board to appoint an interim State Superintendent if the State Board does not appoint or reappoint a State Superintendent by April 1, the Senate does not confirm the appointment or reappointment, or a vacancy occurs in the office of State Superintendent; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0570
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2016
Legislative Date
2/16/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/19 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Special Order until 2/23 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2016
Legislative Date
2/23/2016
Action
Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Proceedings
29
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Favorable 24
Senate 2/16/2016 2/16/2016 Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 24
Senate 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Favorable 26
Senate 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Special Order until 2/19 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 26
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Favorable 27
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Special Order until 2/23 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 27
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Favorable 29
Senate 2/23/2016 2/23/2016 Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky) 29
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM