Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Education Accountability Program - Limits on Testing
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Feldman, Guzzone, Kagan, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Mathias, Peters, Ramirez, Raskin, Salling, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to adopt regulations limiting the amount of time in the aggregate that may be devoted to federal, State, and locally mandated tests for each grade to 2% of the specified minimum required annual instructional hours; and prohibiting time devoted to teacher-selected classroom quizzes and exams, portfolio reviews, or performance assessments from being counted toward the specified testing time limits.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0141
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
13
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2016 1/29/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 13
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM