Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsored by
Senators Garagiola, Astle, Colburn, DeGrange, Glassman, Jacobs, Klausmeier, Muse, Shank, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the State income tax rate on the Maryland taxable income of corporations over a specified period of years.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/29/2013 Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM