Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Muse, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, Zucker, and Astle
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 788
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, on or after January 1, 2018, the administration of specified antimicrobial drugs to cattle, swine, or poultry if, in the professional judgment of a licensed veterinarian, the administration is necessary for specified purposes; prohibiting specified antimicrobial drugs from being administered to cattle, swine, or poultry in a specified pattern or for specified purposes; requiring the Department of Agriculture each year to collect publicly available data on the use in the State of specified antimicrobial drugs; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0602
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {124736/1
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {124736/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {163426/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {540414/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-6)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 788
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments {124736/1 45
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 45
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {124736/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Floor Amendment {163426/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 47
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 52
House 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {540414/1 Adopted 65
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (132-6) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 788
Text - Chapter - Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1001 through 3-1006 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM