Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Reporting
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the date from February 1 to December 1 each year by which the Public Service Commission is required to report to the General Assembly on the status of implementation of the renewable energy portfolio standard.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Reporting
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Service Commission - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Reporting
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Referred Economic Matters 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Text - Chapter - Public Service Commission - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Reporting
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page