Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards
Sponsored by
Senators McCray, Augustine, and Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to adopt regulations, on or before October 1, 2022, that include a certain standard establishing certain heat stress levels and to ensure that all employers comply with certain requirements with respect to occupational exposure to excessive heat; requiring certain employers to develop, implement, and maintain a certain excessive heat-related illness prevention plan for employees; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0722
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Occupational Safety and Health - Heat Stress Standards
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101,   5-1201 through 5-1203 )
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 4:16 PM