Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowner's Insurance - Coverage for Loss Caused by Water Damage
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring insurers that issue, sell, or deliver policies of homeowner's insurance to make available, rather than to offer in writing to provide at specified times, coverage for loss that is caused by specified water damage under specified circumstances; requiring the coverage to be made available in the amount of at least $5,000; authorizing insurers that make specified coverage available to offer specified other coverage in a specified amount, notwithstanding any other law or regulation; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0685
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/27/2015 3/02/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
(   19-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page