Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Youth Camps - Definitions
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "day camp" to include specified youth camps that have campers who reside at the camp for a specified number of days; altering the definition of "residential camp" for purposes of specified provisions of law governing youth camps to increase the number of days a youth camp may operate as a residential camp; and altering the definitions of "travel camp" and "trip camp" to increase the number of days a residential camp may operate as a travel camp or a trip camp.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0918
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2013 1/30/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
1/30/2013 Text - First - Health - Youth Camps - Definitions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM