Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified criminal history records checks for physicians, physician assistants, respiratory care practitioners, radiation oncology/therapy, medical radiation, and nuclear medicine technologists, polysomnographic technologists, athletic trainers, perfusionists, and naturopathic practitioners; requiring, beginning October 1, 2016, specified criminal history records checks for specified annual renewal applicants and former licensees who file for reinstatement under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0574
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {774033/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 45A
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-205, 14-302, 14-302.1, 14-307, 14-308.1, 14-309, 14-312, 14-313, 14-316, 14-320, 14-404, 14-409, 14-5A-09, 14-5A-10, 14-5A-11, 14-5A-13, 14-5A-17, 14-5A-19, 14-5B-09, 14-5B-10, 14-5B-12, 14-5B-14, 14-5B-16, 14-5C-09, 14-5C-11, 14-5C-12, 14-5C-14, 14-5C-17, 14-5C-19, 14-5D-08, 14-5D-09, 14-5D-12, 14-5D-14, 14-5D-16, 14-5E-09, 14-5E-11, 14-5E-13, 14-5E-16, 14-5E-19, 14-5F-11, 14-5F-12, 14-5F-13, 14-5F-15, 14-5F-16, 14-5F-18, 14-5F-24, 15-303, 15-304, 15-305, 15-307, 15-308, 15-311, 15-314 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM