Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone and Kelley
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program in the Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning within the Maryland Department of Labor; requiring the Division to provide certain matching grants to certain entities to create and expand on successful recruitment and retention strategies that address certain barriers to increasing the population of direct care workers; requiring the Division to issue a request for certain applications from certain entities for certain matching grants each year; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {407070/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters Appropriations
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments {407070/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Direct Care Workforce Innovation Program
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Economic Matters Appropriations 44
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1401 through 11-1407 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:05 PM