Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title Fees - Rental Vehicles
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone and McFadden
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making permanent a $50 fee for a certificate of title for a rental vehicle.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {879934/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-4)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 19
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments {879934/1 Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 40
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 43
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-4) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM