Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drivers' Licenses and Identification Cards - Notation of Allergy or Medical Condition
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to include a notation indicating a specified allergy or medical condition on the driver's license or identification card of an applicant who provides specified evidence of the allergy or medical condition to the Administration; requiring that an application for a driver's license or an identification card contain a specified statement; establishing specified requirements for the addition and removal of the notation; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-303.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM