Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts - Definition and Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "mechanical repair contract" for purposes of specified provisions of law establishing requirements for mechanical repair contracts and persons who sell or offer them; establishing that an agreement or contract sold by the person obligated under the agreement or contract may be a mechanical repair contract; prohibiting specified persons who sell mechanical repair contracts from making specified false, deceptive, or misleading statements; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-311.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM