Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County Gaming Commission - Membership - Conflict of Interest
Sponsored by
Senators Shank, Edwards, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law prohibiting a member of the Washington County Gaming Commission from serving on the gaming commission if the member serves on the board of directors or as an officer of an organization that applies for funds from the gaming commission; requiring the gaming commission to adopt conflict of interest regulations applicable to members of the gaming commission; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {699832/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2014
Legislative Date
2/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2014 1/27/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {699832/1 Report Adopted 23
Senate 2/11/2014 2/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23
Senate 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 25
House 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 28
House 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-2416 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM