Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Nathan-Pulliam, Ferguson, King, Lam, Lee, Rosapepe, Smith, Washington, and Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the administration of a medically important antimicrobial drug in feed or water to cattle, swine, or poultry unless ordered by a licensed veterinarian through a certain prescription or a veterinary feed directive; exempting dairy cattle on a farm operation with a herd size of fewer than 300 dairy cattle; requiring the Department of Agriculture, by January 1, 2021, to adopt regulations prohibiting the routine administration of a medically important antimicrobial drug to dairy cattle entering a dry cycle except in certain cases; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0652
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {694338/1
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {694338/1
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {694338/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {603120/2 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {973629/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-30)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-16)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {840610/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-40)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-13)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {694338/1 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {694338/1 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {694338/1 Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {603120/2 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {973629/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-30) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (30-16) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments {840610/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (96-40) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (31-13) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679
Text - Chapter - Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements
(   3-1001 through 3-1005, 3-1006 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page