Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Nathan-Pulliam, Ferguson, King, Lam, Lee, Rosapepe, Smith, Washington, and Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the administration of a medically important antimicrobial drug in feed or water to cattle, swine, or poultry unless ordered by a licensed veterinarian through a certain prescription or a veterinary feed directive; exempting dairy cattle on a farm operation with a herd size of fewer than 300 dairy cattle; requiring the Department of Agriculture, by January 1, 2021, to adopt regulations prohibiting the routine administration of a medically important antimicrobial drug to dairy cattle entering a dry cycle except in certain cases; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0652
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {694338/1 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {694338/1 43
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 43
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {694338/1 Adopted 45A
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {603120/2 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 45A
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {973629/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-30) 45A
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45A
Text - Third - Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (30-16) 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 47
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments {840610/1 Adopted 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (96-40) 57
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (31-13) 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679
Text - Chapter - Agriculture - Use of Antimicrobial Drugs - Limitations and Reporting Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1001 through 3-1005, 3-1006 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:36 AM