Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce - Mutual Consent
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a court to decree an absolute divorce on the grounds of mutual consent if the parties do not have any minor children in common and the parties execute and submit to the court a written settlement agreement signed by both parties resolving specified issues; authorizing a court to merge or incorporate a specified settlement agreement into a specified divorce decree; authorizing a court to modify or enforce a specified settlement agreement consistent with specified provisions of law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0363 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {288478/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {288478/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (39-7)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {322410/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (104-34)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-6)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {288478/1 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {288478/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (39-7) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Judiciary 48
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable with Amendments {322410/1 Report Adopted 68
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (104-34) 69
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (40-6) 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Passed Enrolled 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 353
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-103 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:39 PM