Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring employers with more than nine employees to provide employees with earned sick and safe leave that is paid at the same rate as the employee normally earns; requiring employers with nine or fewer employees to provide an employee with unpaid earned sick and safe leave; providing for the manner in which earned sick and safe leave is accrued by the employee and treated by the employer; requiring an employer to allow an employee to use earned sick and safe leave for specified purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0580
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2016 2/03/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-106, 3-103, 3-1301 through 3-1311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM