Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District Management Authority - Distribution of Local Impact Grants
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 751
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that the State distribute certain funding directly to the South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District Management Authority; and providing, under certain circumstances, that the State distribute directly to the Authority not less than the 50% of the local impact grants from video lottery proceeds required to be distributed under a certain law.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {499431/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {435866/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 751
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District Management Authority - Distribution of Local Impact Grants
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {499431/1 Adopted 35
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District Management Authority - Distribution of Local Impact Grants
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 37
House 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Referred Ways and Means 38
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {435866/1 Adopted 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District Management Authority - Distribution of Local Impact Grants
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 751
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - South Baltimore Gateway Community Impact District Management Authority - Distribution of Local Impact Grants
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM