Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on the Implementation of Tax Benefits for Emergency Preparedness Equipment
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Madaleno, and Raskin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Implementation of Tax Benefits for Emergency Preparedness; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding the implementation of an income tax credit for the purchase of electric generators or a tax-free period for emergency preparedness equipment; requiring the Task Force to present a report on or before December 31, 2013; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {589733/1
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {589733/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {623325/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {589733/1 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Favorable with Amendments {589733/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {623325/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 64
House 4/06/2013 4/06/2013 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Hearing 4/08 at 11:30 a.m.
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM