Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Increasing the amount an individual or corporation may claim as a credit against the State income tax for specified costs incurred to obtain federal security clearances and to construct or renovate specified sensitive compartmented information facilities in the State; authorizing an individual or corporation to claim as a credit against the State income tax specified rental expenses if the individual or corporation is a small business that performs security-based contracting; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {109335/1
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {109335/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-25)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/07/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/31/2013 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {109335/1 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {109335/1 Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 62
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/06/2013 4/06/2013 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Hearing 4/08 at 11:30 a.m.
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (109-25) 69
Senate 4/09/2013 4/07/2013 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-732 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM