Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Madaleno, Montgomery, Raskin, Waugh, Zirkin, Gladden, Muse, and Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that it is lawful under a specified provision of law for a law enforcement officer to intercept a specified oral communication with a specified device under specified circumstances; requiring on or before January 1, 2016, the Maryland Police Training Commission to develop and publish online a policy for the issuance and use of a body-worn camera by a law enforcement officer; establishing the Commission Regarding the Implementation and Use of Body Cameras by Law Enforcement Officers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0627
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {228574/1
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Astle) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {228574/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Astle) {543628/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {133225/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Klausmeier) {313220/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {603520/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Manno) {633124/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-12)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments {228574/1 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Astle) Adopted 61
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {228574/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Astle) {543628/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {133225/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Klausmeier) {313220/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {603520/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Special Order until later today (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Manno) {633124/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 68
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Second Reading Passed 70
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (125-12) 72
Senate 4/14/2015 4/10/2015 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:26 AM