Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Managed Care Organizations - Behavioral Health Services
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Feldman, Jennings, Klausmeier, Kramer, and Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, subject to certain limitations, to provide reimbursement for certain medically necessary and appropriate behavioral health services to managed care organizations; requiring managed care organizations, rather than a certain delivery system, to provide certain health services beginning January 1, 2021; requiring the Secretary of Health to include in certain capitation payments funding for community provider rates; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0846
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Managed Care Organizations - Behavioral Health Services
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM