Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Facilities – Dialysis Treatment Services – Training (David Selby Dialysis Parity Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a health care facility from providing peritoneal dialysis or hemodialysis treatment services unless the individual performing the dialysis procedure has been trained in the peritoneal dialysis or hemodialysis technique being performed; establishing civil penalties not exceeding $5,000 for each violation of the Act; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {697073/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Care Facilities - Dialysis Treatment Services - Training (Dialysis Parity Act)
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable with Amendments {697073/1 Adopted 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Text - Third - Health Care Facilities – Dialysis Treatment Services – Training (David Selby Dialysis Parity Act)
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 42A
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/16/2020 5:07 PM