Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Municipal Wastewater Facilities
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt, Carozza, Hough, and Young
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the authorized uses of the Bay Restoration Fund to include certain costs associated with the connection of a property using an on-site sewage disposal system to an existing municipal wastewater facility that has signed a funding agreement with the Department of the Environment and is under construction to achieve enhanced nutrient removal or biological nutrient removal level treatment; specifying that these costs may be provided only if certain conditions are met; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1035
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {574636/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Municipal Wastewater Facilities
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
33
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Bay Restoration Fund – Use of Funds – Municipal Wastewater Facilities
Senate 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments {574636/1 Adopted 30
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Municipal Wastewater Facilities
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 32
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 33
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/11/2020 3:25 PM