Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Court Appearance
Sponsored by
Senators Norman and Lee
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that both parties appear before the court at an absolute divorce hearing in order for the court to decree an absolute divorce on the grounds of mutual consent.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Court Appearance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Court Appearance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-5)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Court Appearance
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Favorable Adopted 28
Senate 2/21/2017 2/21/2017 Second Reading Passed 28
Text - Third - Family Law - Divorce on Grounds of Mutual Consent - Court Appearance
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (42-5) 30
House 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Referred Judiciary 33
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM