Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsored by
Senator Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include for fiscal year 2018 and each fiscal year thereafter an additional $11,000,000 in annual appropriations for tobacco use prevention and cessation programs; altering the tobacco tax rates on cigarettes and other tobacco products; establishing the tobacco tax rates on cigarillos; clarifying that all cigarettes and other tobacco products used, possessed, or held in the State on or after July 1, 2016, are subject to the full tax enacted under the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0071
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM