Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education - Procurements for Construction or Repair of School Projects
Sponsored by
Senator DeGrange
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Making specified provisions of law concerning the advertising for bids for procurements costing more than $25,000 applicable to construction or repair for public school projects in the State; including construction and repair projects under provisions of law concerning the award of procurement contracts, as specified; requiring the award of specified contracts to consider a plan for meeting or exceeding the State's Minority Business Enterprise goals; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0330
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {609232/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Brochin) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {773321/2 Rejected (18-27)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {193527/1 Rejected (20-23)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {943922/1 Rejected (19-24)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Norman) {223926/1 Rejected (16-29)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-16)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2016 2/04/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments {609232/1 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Committee Amendment Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Brochin) Adopted 58
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {773321/2 Rejected (18-27) 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {193527/1 Rejected (20-23) 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {943922/1 Rejected (19-24) 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Norman) {223926/1 Rejected (16-29) 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (30-16) 60
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 64
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-112 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM