Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education - School Buses - Motor Fuel Tax Exemption and Refund
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from the motor fuel tax for motor fuel that is bought by a county board of education or a school bus operator under contract with a county board of education for use in a school bus; authorizing a county board of education to claim a refund of a motor fuel tax paid on motor fuel purchased for use in a school bus used to transport the county's public school students; authorizing a specified school bus operator to claim a refund of a motor fuel tax paid for specified purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0756
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/04/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {129338/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {395367/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2016 2/04/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {129338/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 43
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {395367/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-901, 9-303 )
(   11-153, 11-154, 11-173 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM